Azzam, Khalid Mohammad (CPSO#: 87499)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Jul 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Academic Practice as of 18 Jul 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Rajasthan University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton General Hospital
Department of Medicine
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: 905-521-2100 Ext. 45149
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Khalid Azzam Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 20 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Azzam ( CPSO# 87499 )

Business Address:
Hamilton General Hospital HHS
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 527-0271

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Manitoba

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 10 Nov 2015 RCPSC Specialist
General Internal Medicine Effective: 10 Nov 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KHALID MOHAMMAD AZZAM may practise medicine only in a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the DEPARTMENT OF INTERNAL MEDICINE, HAMILTON HEALTH SCIENCES, HAMILTON GENERAL HOSPITAL in which Dr. AZZAM holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment at the rank of full or associate professor;

(2) Dr. AZZAM may practise medicine only to the extent required by the teaching or research requirements of the appointment referred to in clause (1);

(3) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. AZZAM no longer holds certification by the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada or the College of Family Physicians of Canada,

(ii) When Dr. AZZAM no longer holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment to the academic staff of an accredited medical school in Ontario at the rank of full or associate professor,

(iii) When Dr. AZZAM no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

NOTE: The expiry date of this certificate is as explained above.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Aug 2012
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 24 Aug 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 18 Jul 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 2016