Azzie, Georges Ralph (CPSO#: 56719)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jun 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:University of Toronto, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of General Surgery
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7654 Ext. 202413
Fax: (416) 813-7477
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: G. Azzie Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 15 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Azzie ( CPSO# 56719 )

Business Address:
Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone Number: (416) 242-1000

Business Address:
The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of General Surgery
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 813-7654

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Botswana

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 09 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist
Pediatric General Surgery Effective: 30 Nov 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GEORGES RALPH AZZIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AZZIE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 31 Dec 1992
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jun 2000