Budisin, Branko (CPSO#: 77508)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Bosnian, Croatian, English, Serbian, Yugoslav

Education:Queen's University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Room G03
3000 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V1
Phone: (416) 438-6636
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

7 Metcalfe Street
Trenton ON  K8V 6H3
Canada
Phone: (613) 392-8965
County: County of Hastings
Electoral District: 06

298 Sheppard Ave East
Toronto ON  M2N 3B1
Canada
Phone: (416) 223-6500
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Aziza Clemens Gilloteaux Kundu Shuckett Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 26 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Gilloteaux ( CPSO# 81765 )
Dr. B. Budisin ( CPSO# 77508 )
Dr. M. Shoichet ( CPSO# 88856 )
Dr. J. Woodley-Cook ( CPSO# 90936 )
Dr. R. Clemens ( CPSO# 50261 )
Dr. B. Shuckett ( CPSO# 33666 )
Dr. J. Aziza ( CPSO# 54826 )
Dr. S. Kundu ( CPSO# 68121 )
Dr. J. Nazareno ( CPSO# 77684 )

Business Address:
3000 Lawrence Avenue East
Suite G03
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V2
Phone Number: (416) 438-6636

Business Address:
3050 Lawrence Street East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone Number: (416) 431-8107


Corporation Name: Branko Budisin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 18 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Budisin ( CPSO# 77508 )

Business Address:
Scarborough Hospital General Campus
Department of Diagnostic Radiology
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone Number: (416) 431-8107

Business Address:
3000 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V2
Phone Number: (416) 438-6636

Business Address:
298 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2N 3B1
Phone Number: (416) 223-6500

Business Address:
7 Metcalfe Street
Trenton ON  K8V 6H3
Phone Number: (613) 392-8965

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRANKO BUDISIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BUDISIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2007