Slagel, Bradley Earl (CPSO#: 79472)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
240 McNabb Street
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 1Y5
Phone: (705) 759-1234
Fax: (705) 759-5683
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Fera Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 27 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Patterson ( CPSO# 91088 )
Dr. A. Schamp ( CPSO# 82979 )
Dr. C. Kuntz ( CPSO# 84476 )
Dr. M. Hemy ( CPSO# 86777 )
Dr. K. Zufelt ( CPSO# 67007 )
Dr. J. Lane ( CPSO# 61549 )
Dr. D. Fritz ( CPSO# 60812 )
Dr. B. Mitchell ( CPSO# 59931 )
Dr. S. Bondar ( CPSO# 59698 )
Dr. M. Keating ( CPSO# 57489 )
Dr. M. Mogharrabi ( CPSO# 57473 )
Dr. C. Bruni ( CPSO# 55651 )
Dr. M. Edwards ( CPSO# 52889 )
Dr. R. Wytsma ( CPSO# 52032 )
Dr. M. Mathew ( CPSO# 44024 )
Dr. M. Hackett ( CPSO# 33820 )
Dr. D. Fera ( CPSO# 33299 )
Dr. K. Opryszczko ( CPSO# 89989 )
Dr. J. Keuhl ( CPSO# 88070 )
Dr. E. Hirvi ( CPSO# 84322 )
Dr. D. Micomonaco ( CPSO# 80815 )
Dr. J. Reich ( CPSO# 73103 )
Dr. S. Allen ( CPSO# 73014 )
Dr. B. Slagel ( CPSO# 79472 )
Dr. J. DellaVedova ( CPSO# 91071 )
Dr. J. Bishop ( CPSO# 96910 )
Dr. M. Jenkins ( CPSO# 99889 )
Dr. J. Jonusaitis ( CPSO# 100796)
Dr. L. Bonder ( CPSO# 90576 )
Dr. W. Wallace ( CPSO# 92960 )
Dr. H. Gupta ( CPSO# 78301 )
Dr. K. Taylor ( CPSO# 75094 )
Dr. G. Yee ( CPSO# 70560 )
Dr. W. Chung ( CPSO# 99567 )
Dr. B. Banks ( CPSO# 99188 )
Dr. V. Coccimiglio ( CPSO# 101205)
Dr. M. Vance ( CPSO# 101038)
Dr. S. Buehner ( CPSO# 65582 )
Dr. P. Zehr ( CPSO# 59997 )
Dr. M. Lee ( CPSO# 62320 )
Dr. M. Wilson ( CPSO# 69274 )
Dr. C. Kobelka ( CPSO# 62567 )
Dr. A. Fam ( CPSO# 62586 )
Dr. C. Rossi ( CPSO# 51523 )
Dr. P. Ciaschini ( CPSO# 52948 )
Dr. P. Bragaglia ( CPSO# 33769 )
Dr. M. Leahy ( CPSO# 57088 )
Dr. J. Stewart ( CPSO# 72520 )

Business Address:
773 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 5K7
Phone Number: (705) 759-5540

Business Address:
240 McNabb Street
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 1Y5
Phone Number: (705) 759-5540

Business Address:
170 East Street
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 3C6
Phone Number: (705) 759-5540

Business Address:
955 Queen Street East
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 2C3
Phone Number: (705) 549-5540

Business Address:
974 Queen Street East
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 2C2
Phone Number: (705) 759-5540


Corporation Name: Bradley E. Slagel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 12 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Slagel ( CPSO# 79472 )

Business Address:
240 McNabb Street
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 1Y5
Phone Number: (705) 759-1234

Business Address:
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Phone Number: (705) 759-1234

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRADLEY EARL SLAGEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SLAGEL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Aug 2008
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Jul 2009
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Jul 2010
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2008