Baaqeel, Rasha Hassan S (CPSO#: 92409)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 12 Jan 2010 to 25 Jan 2010
PEAP - Resident - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 26 Jan 2010 to 31 Mar 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Sep 2010 to 12 Nov 2010
PEAP - Resident - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 13 Nov 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 12 Nov 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 13 Nov 2011 to 12 Nov 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 13 Nov 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Jan 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Nov 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016