Baath, Jasrajbir (CPSO#: 88769)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 217
2250 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 0W3
Phone: (905) 497-1188
Fax: (905) 497-1189
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

249 Ontario Street
Suite 207
Port Hope ON  L1A 3Y9
Canada
County: County of Northumberland
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Baath Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 02 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Baath ( CPSO# 88769 )

Business Address:
217 - 2250 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 0W3
Phone Number: (905) 497-1188

Business Address:
Suite 207
249 Ontario Street
Port Hope ON  L1A 3Y9
Phone Number: (905) 885-7888

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JASRAJBIR BAATH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAATH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013