Babic, Bojana (CPSO#: 76073)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Bosnian, Croatian, English, Serbian

Education:McMaster University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1280 Main St. West
General Pediatrics-3A
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: 905-521-2100 Ext. 75639
Fax: 905-521-4981
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

825 Coxwell Avenue
Teen and Child Clinic
Michael Garron Hospital
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Canada
Phone: (416) 469-6590
Fax: (416) 469-6591
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Babic Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 27 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Babic ( CPSO# 76073 )

Business Address:
McMaster Children's Hospital
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Healthcare
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-4941

Business Address:
TEGH
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone Number: (416) 461-8272

Business Address:
9 Lake Avenue
Stoney Creek ON  L8G 2V1
Phone Number: (905) 664-9992

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 19 Sep 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BOJANA BABIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BABIC is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2005