Bacchus, Farzana Roshenne (CPSO#: 86326)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Sep 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Health Partners
Queensway Health Centre
Medical Clinics 2nd Floor
150 Sherway Drive
Toronto ON  M9C 1A5
Phone: (416) 521-4196
Fax: (416) 521-4082
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lau Bacchus Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 28 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Lau ( CPSO# 88655 )
Dr. F. Bacchus ( CPSO# 86326 )

Business Address:
Trillium Health Partners
Queensway Health Centre
Medical Clinics-2nd Floor
150 Sherway Drive
Toronto ON  M9C 1A5
Phone Number: (416) 521-4196

Business Address:
Suite 501
25 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 1Y2
Phone Number: (905) 529-1317

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 12 Oct 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FARZANA ROSHENNE BACCHUS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BACCHUS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Sep 2011