Bacher, Adrienne Sonia (CPSO#: 95905)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Aug 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4580
Fax: (416) 480-4233
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2115 Finch Ave. W
Suite 405
Toronto ON  M3N 2V6
Canada
Phone: 416-741-2456 Ext. 3
Fax: 416-741-2454
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Adrienne Bacher Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 12 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Bacher ( CPSO# 95905 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4580

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 06 Oct 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ADRIENNE SONIA BACHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BACHER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Sep 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Aug 2015