Bacher, Janice Karen (CPSO#: 93621)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Davisville Family Practice
Suite 600
1881 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4S 3C4
Phone: (416) 932-3172
Fax: (416) 440-0238
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Larry Bacher Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 14 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Bacher ( CPSO# 93621 )
Dr. L. Bacher ( CPSO# 33345 )
Dr. C. Bacher ( CPSO# 106716)
Dr. J. Bacher ( CPSO# 95078 )

Business Address:
Malvern Medical Centre
Suite 100
1333 Neilson Road
Scarborough ON  M1B 4Y9
Phone Number: (416) 291-7719

Business Address:
Wexford Nursing Home
1860 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1R 5B1
Phone Number: (416) 752-8877

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JANICE KAREN BACHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BACHER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2012