Backstein, Richard Manuel (CPSO#: 86705)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Apr 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Apr 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Centre For Minor Surgery
5109 Steeles Ave. W.
Suite 300
Toronto ON  M9L 2Y8
Phone: 416-663-9649
Fax: 416-663-7407
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

25 Main Street N
Markham ON  L3P1X2
Canada
Phone: 905-471-5022
Fax: 905-472-3366
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Suite 305
800 Queenston Rd.
Hamilton ON  L8G 1A7
Canada
Phone: 905-549-1025
Fax: 905-549-9487
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Suite 306
1366 Yonge St.
Toronto ON  M4T3A7
Canada
Phone: 416-487-3453
Fax: 416-487-5528
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Suite 319
1333 Sheppard Ave. E
North York ON  M2J 1V1
Canada
Phone: 416-502-1000
Fax: 416-502-1030
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Suite G-5
250 St. Clair Ave. W
Toronto ON  M4V1R6
Canada
Phone: 416-840-3339
Fax: 416-840-0019
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Suite 205
3292 Bayview Ave.
North York ON  M2M4J5
Canada
Phone: 416-222-7546
Fax: 416-221-7546
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Richard Backstein Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 05 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Backstein ( CPSO# 86705 )

Business Address:
25 Main Street North
Markham ON  L3P 1X2
Phone Number: (905) 471-5022

Business Address:
Suite 305
800 Queenston Road
Hamilton ON  L8G 1A7
Phone Number: (905) 549-1025

Business Address:
Suite 306
1366 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4T 3A7
Phone Number: (416) 487-3453

Business Address:
Suite 319
1333 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2J 1V1
Phone Number: (416) 502-1000

Business Address:
McLean Clinic
Suite 343
50 Burnhampthorpe Road West
Mississauga ON  L5B 3C2
Phone Number: (905) 273-4888

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RICHARD MANUEL BACKSTEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BACKSTEIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Apr 2013