Badalato, Heather Ann (CPSO#: 84494)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Homewood Health Centre
150 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 6K9
Phone: (519) 824-1010 Ext. 2123
Fax: (519) 767-3536
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

ACT Clinics
664 Barton St E
Hamilton ON  L8L 3A4
Canada
Phone: (289) 799-2135
Fax: (289) 667-0022
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Joseph Brant Hospital
1230 North Shore Blvd E, Burlington
Burlington ON  L7S 1W7
Canada
Phone: (905) 632-3737
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. P. Channan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 04 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Badalato ( CPSO# 84494 )
Dr. P. Channan ( CPSO# 82883 )

Business Address:
Trillium Health Centre
Department of Emergency Medicine
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone Number: (905) 848-7100

Business Address:
William Osler Health Centre
2100 Bovaird Drive
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Healthcare
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Business Address:
Hamilton Health Sciences
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 527-4322


Corporation Name: Dr. H. Badalato Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 13 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Badalato ( CPSO# 84494 )

Business Address:
664 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 3A4
Phone Number: (289) 799-2135

Business Address:
Homewood Health Care
150 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 6K9
Phone Number: (519) 824-1010

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Homewood Health Centre Guelph
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HEATHER ANN BADALATO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BADALATO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2008