Badalato, Lauren Dawn (CPSO#: 95848)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: 6135483232 Ext. 7958
Fax: 6135481348
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lauren Badalato Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 01 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Badalato ( CPSO# 95848 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 548-2467

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Medical Genetics Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LAUREN DAWN BADALATO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BADALATO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Medical Genetics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Medical Genetics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Medical Genetics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Genetics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Genetics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 02 May 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Genetics

University of Ottawa, 03 May 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Genetics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017