Badhwar, Vinay (CPSO#: 72539)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Sep 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Sep 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Ottawa, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiac Surgery Effective: 30 Sep 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Resident 6 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Resident 7 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Sep 2000
Resident 8 - Cardiac Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2000