Badi, Entisar Mohamed (CPSO#: 73075)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Sep 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Sep 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Al Fateh, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
10083 Keele St
Suite 200
Maple ON  L6A 3Y8
Phone: (905) 879-0505
Fax: (905) 879-0606
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ENTISAR MOHAMED BADI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BADI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 21 Sep 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 22 Sep 1999 to 21 Sep 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 22 Sep 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Mar 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Sep 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 2005