Badmos, Oluleke Salimon (CPSO#: 71798)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jul 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ibadan, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 307
688 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3B7
Phone: (416) 778-9893
Fax: (416) 778-6065
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Albany Medical clinic
807 Broadview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4K 2P8
Canada
Phone: (416) 778-9893
Fax: (416) 778-6065
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Leke Badmos Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 29 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. O. Badmos ( CPSO# 71798 )

Business Address:
Suite 307
688 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3B7
Phone Number: (416) 778-9893


Corporation Name: Rajani Adno Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 27 2010

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 06 Jul 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. OLULEKE SALIMON BADMOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BADMOS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 1998