Bafaquh, Mohammed Saeed (CPSO#: 83492)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Ottawa, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 27 May 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 02 Sep 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 03 Sep 2010 to 02 Sep 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 03 Sep 2011 to 02 Sep 2012
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 03 Sep 2012 to 08 Oct 2012
Research Fellows - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 09 Oct 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 03 Sep 2013
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 04 Sep 2013 to 15 Dec 2013
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 16 Dec 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014