Bageria, Charanjit Singh (CPSO#: 68025)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3348 Keele Street
Downsview ON  M3J 1L5
Phone: (416) 398-2505
Fax: (647) 342-8478
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. C. Bageria Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 02 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Bageria ( CPSO# 68025 )

Business Address:
3348 Keele Street
Downsview ON  M3J 1L5
Phone Number: (416) 398-2505

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHARANJIT SINGH BAGERIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAGERIA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1996