Baharnoori, Moogeh (CPSO#: 93180)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 May 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 May 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Persian

Education:University of Tehran, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 548-3232
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Moogeh Baharnoori Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 14 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Baharnoori ( CPSO# 93180 )

Business Address:
Kingston Health Sciences Centre
KGH Site
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 548-3232

Business Address:
Kingston Health Sciences Centre
HDH Site
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3310

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MOOGEH BAHARNOORI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAHARNOORI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 01 Oct 2010
Assessment Verification Period - Neurology

University of Toronto, 02 Oct 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Oct 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 May 2017