Bahra, Parminder Singh (CPSO#: 62384)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Colborne St Clinic
347 Colborne St
Brantford ON  N3S 2N2
Phone: (519) 754-2893
Fax: (519) 758-0182
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

The St Paul St Clinic
5 Bond St
St Catharines ON  L2R 4Z1
Canada
Phone: (905) 684-2777
Fax: (905) 684-2776
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

The Water Street Clinic
80 Norfolk St S
Simcoe ON  N3Y 2W2
Canada
Phone: (519) 428-4676
Fax: (519) 428-1982
County: Regional Municipality of Haldimand-Norfolk
Electoral District: 04

The Barton St Clinic
1354 Barton St East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2W3
Canada
Phone: (905) 547-5117
Fax: (905) 547-6943
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Parminder Bahra Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 3 2014


Corporation Name: Dr. P.S. Bahra Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 17 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Bahra ( CPSO# 62384 )

Business Address:
The Colborne Street Clinic
347 Colborne Street
Brantford ON  N3S 3N2
Phone Number: (519) 754-2893

Business Address:
The Water Street Clinic
80 Norfork Street
Simcoe ON  N3Y 2W2
Phone Number: (519) 428-4676

Business Address:
The Barton Street Clinic
1354 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8H 2W3
Phone Number: (905) 547-5117

Business Address:
753 Sour Spring Road
Ohsweken ON  N0A 1M0
Phone Number: (519) 445-1744

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 07 Dec 2000 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Dec 1999 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PARMINDER SINGH BAHRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAHRA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1991