Bahramifarid, Nasim (CPSO#: 97898)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Italian, Persian, Spanish

Education:University of Ottawa, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Montfort Hospital
Department of Family Medicine
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone: (613) 746-4621
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

801 Promenade de l'Aviation
Ottawa ON  K1K 4R3
Canada
Phone: 613 742-2483
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

4275 Innes Rd, Suite 104
Ottawa ON  K1C 1T1
Canada
Phone: (613) 424-6343
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nasim Bahramifarid Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 14 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Bahramifarid ( CPSO# 97898 )

Business Address:
Montfort Hospital
Department of Family Medicine
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone Number: (613) 746-4621

Business Address:
104 - 4275 Innes Road
Ottawa ON  K2C 1T1
Phone Number: (613) 424-6343

Business Address:
B1060 - 801 Aviation Parkway
Ottawa ON  K1K 4R3
Phone Number: (613) 742-2483

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 27 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NASIM BAHRAMIFARID may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAHRAMIFARID is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2014