Bahrgard Nikoo, Mohammad Javad (CPSO#: 83434)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:Guilan University of Medical Sciences, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St.Mary's General Hospital
Department of Critical Care
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Phone: (519) 749-6428
Fax: (519) 749-6426
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Department of Critical Care
Grand River Hospital
835 King St. West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Canada
Phone: (519) 749-4300
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mohammad Javad Bahrgard Nikoo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 01 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Bahrgard Nikoo ( CPSO# 83434 )

Business Address:
St. Mary's General Hospital
Department of Internal Medicine
Division of Critical Care
911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Phone Number: (519) 749-6428

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 27 Sep 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MOHAMMAD JAVAD BAHRGARD NIKOO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAHRGARD NIKOO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 22 Sep 2005
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009