Baibergenova, Akerke Tulegenovna (CPSO#: 86314)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Russian

Education:Kazakh State Medical University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
401 - 13291 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4E 4L6
Phone: (905) 773-1599
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

M1-700 - 3292 Bayview Avenue
North York ON  M2M 4J5
Canada
Phone: (416) 480-4908
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

2 Champagne Drive
Polyclinic Specialty Medicine Clini
Toronto ON  M3J 2C5
Canada
Phone: (416) 222-6160 Ext. 228
Fax: (416) 222-9604
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Akerke Baibergenova Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 10 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Baibergenova ( CPSO# 86314 )

Business Address:
2 Champagne Drive
North York ON  M3J 2C5
Phone Number: (416) 222-6160

Business Address:
401 - 13291 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4E 4L6
Phone Number: (905) 773-1599

Business Address:
205 - 3292 Bayview Avenue
North York ON  M2M 4J5
Phone Number: (416) 222-7546

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AKERKE TULEGENOVNA BAIBERGENOVA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAIBERGENOVA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012