Bailey, Jillian Catherine (CPSO#: 82402)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Dec 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
140 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville ON  L9W 4X9
Phone: (519) 941-7575
Fax: (519) 941-7060
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Headwaters Health Care Centre
100 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville ON  L9W 4X9
Canada
Phone: (519) 941-2410
County: County of Dufferin
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jillian Bailey Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 28 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Bailey ( CPSO# 82402 )

Business Address:
140 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville ON  L9W 4X9
Phone Number: (519) 941-7575

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Headwaters Health Care Centre,Orangeville-Dufferin Site Orangeville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Dec 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JILLIAN CATHERINE BAILEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAILEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Dec 2007