Bailey, Karen Allison (CPSO#: 72377)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster Children's Hospital
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 75231
Fax: (905) 521-9992
Electoral District: 04

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Guyana

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist
Pediatric General Surgery Effective: 15 Sep 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KAREN ALLISON BAILEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAILEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 6 - Pediatric General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 6 - Pediatric General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 7 - Pediatric General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 2004