Baillie, Jane Irmgard (CPSO#: 76602)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Aug 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 309
3155 Harvester Road
Burlington ON  L7N 3V2
Phone: (289) 337-1663
Fax: (289) 337-4407
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jane Baillie Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 07 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Baillie ( CPSO# 76602 )

Business Address:
Suite 309
3155 Harvester Road
Burlington ON  L7N 3V2
Phone Number: (289) 337-1663

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 31 Jul 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JANE IRMGARD BAILLIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAILLIE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 08 Feb 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 09 Feb 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Jul 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 2006