Baines, Alexandra Sawczenko (CPSO#: 96939)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Oct 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Oct 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Royal Ottawa Hospital
Schizophrenia Program
1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Z 7K4
Phone: (613) 722-6521
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Royal Ottawa Place
Royal Ottawa Hospital
1141 Carling Ave.
Ottawa ON  K1Z 7K4
Canada
Phone: (613) 722-6521
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

On Track-Champlain District
Regional First Episode Psychosis
Program
1355 Bank St. Suite 208
Ottawa ON  K1H 8K7
Canada
Phone: (613) 737-8069
Fax: (613) 737-8318
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: E. G. Clark Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 24 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Baines ( CPSO# 96939 )
Dr. E. Clark ( CPSO# 87888 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital-Riverside Campus
Division of Nephrology
1967 Prom. Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Phone Number: (613) 789-5555

Business Address:
Royal Ottawa Hospital
Schizophrenia Program
1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Z 7K4

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 05 Sep 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALEXANDRA SAWCZENKO BAINES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAINES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 04 Dec 2012
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Oct 2011