Bains, Rajdeep Inder (CPSO#: 89498)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Jan 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jan 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Rajah Muthiah Medical College, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 6
875 Main Street East
Milton ON  L9T 3Z3
Phone: (905) 875-0955
Fax: 289 429 0121
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bains Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 30 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Bains ( CPSO# 89498 )

Business Address:
Suite 6
875 Main Street East
Milton ON  L9T 3Z3
Phone Number: (905) 875-0955

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Milton Site Halton Healthcare Services Milton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Dec 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAJDEEP INDER BAINS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAINS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Sep 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jan 2011