Baird, David Ferguson (CPSO#: 87971)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:National University of Ireland, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Collingwood General
and Marine Hospital
459 Hume Street
Collingwood ON  L9Y 1W9
Phone: (705) 445-2550
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Ferguson Baird Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 11 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Baird ( CPSO# 87971 )

Business Address:
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital
459 Hume Street
Collingwood ON  L9Y 1W9
Phone Number: (705) 445-2550

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood
Muskoka Algonquin Health Care,South Muskoka Memorial Site Bracebridge

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID FERGUSON BAIRD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAIRD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 10 Jan 2008 to 19 Mar 2008
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Mar 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jun 2009