Baird, Wycliffe Hobart (CPSO#: 24565)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Feb 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 08 Jul 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Dalhousie University, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
High Point Medical Centre
303 - 3461 Dixie Rd
Mississauga ON  L4Y 3X4
Phone: (905) 625-0889
Fax: (905) 625-9702
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

No Privileges reported.

Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  July 9, 2014
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
On July 15, 2014, Trillium Health Partners notified the College that Dr. Wycliffe H. Baird's privileges were suspended, effective July 9, 2014. On September 11, 2014, Trillium Health Partners notified the College of the termination of the suspension consequent to Dr. Baird's retirement and relinquishment of privileges, effective September 10, 2014.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 1972
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Jul 2016
Terms and conditions amended Effective: 01 Nov 2017
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 01 Dec 2017
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 01 Feb 2018
Terms and conditions amended Effective: 06 Feb 2018
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 11 Jul 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 11 Jul 2018 Active View Details [+]
            (1 of 2) As from June 13, 2018, the following is imposed as a term, condition
            and limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Wycliffe Hobart
            Baird in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Baird to the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                                    DR. WYCLIFFE HOBART BAIRD
                                          ("Dr. Baird")
                  
                                                to 
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
                  
                  
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College.
                  
                  "Narcotic Drugs" means from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under
                  the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19, as amended.
                  "Narcotic Preparations" means from the Narcotic Control Regulations made
                  under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19, as
                  amended.
                  "Controlled Drugs" means from Part G of the Food and Drug Regulations
                  under the Food and Drugs Act, S.C., 1985, c. F-27, as amended.
                  "Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances" means from the
                  Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances Regulations made under the
                  Controlled Drugs and Substances Act., S.C., 1996, c. 19, as amended 
                  
                  (A summary of the above-named drugs [from Appendix I to the Compendium of
                  Pharmaceuticals and Specialties] is attached hereto as Schedule "A"; and
                  the current regulatory lists are attached hereto as Schedule "B")
                  
                  "All other Monitored Drugs" means as defined under the Narcotics Safety
                  and Awareness Act, 2010, S.O. 2010, c. 22, as amended, as noted in
                  Schedule "C".                                                
                  
                  "NMS" means the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics Monitoring
                  System implemented under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010,
                  S.O. 2010, c. 22, as amended;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Baird, certificate of registration number 24565 am a member of the
                  College. 

            (3)   I, Dr. Baird, acknowledge that the College has received information
                  regarding my standard of practice and conduct and that the College is
                  conducting an investigation, bearing File Number 7216339, into the
                  information. 

            (4)   I, Dr. Baird, acknowledge that the ICR Committee has accepted this
                  Undertaking in lieu of making an Order under section 25.4 of the Code at
                  this time.

            (5)   I, Dr. Baird, acknowledge that this Undertaking does not preclude the ICR
                  Committee from making an order at a later date in accordance with the
                  Code.

            (6)   I, Dr. Baird, acknowledge that this Undertaking continues in force until
                  the matters currently being investigated are disposed of by a panel of
                  the ICR Committee or the Discipline Committee.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (7)   I, Dr. Baird, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective immediately ("Effective Date").

            (8)   I, Dr. Baird, shall keep a Log of all prescriptions for Narcotic Drugs,
                  Narcotic Preparations, Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines and Other
                  Targeted Substances and All other Monitored Drugs, in the form attached
                  as set out in Schedule "D", which will include at least the following
                  information (the "Prescribing Log"):  

                        (i)   the date of the appointment;
                        (ii)  the name of the patient and chart/file number;
                        (iii) the name of the medication prescribed, dose, direction,
                              number of tablets to be dispensed and frequency;
                        (iv)  the clinical indication;
                        (v)   whether the prescription is for a new medication and/or
                              different dose or frequency than currently prescribed to the
                              patient (Y/N); 
                        (vi)  Dr. Baird's signature;
                        (vii) the date of the Clinical Supervisor's review (if applicable,
                              as set out below); and
                        (viii)the Clinical Supervisor's signature (if applicable, as set
                              out below).
                  
            (9)   I, Dr. Baird, undertake to keep a copy of all prescriptions I write for
                  Narcotic Drugs, Narcotic Preparations, Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines
                  and Other Targeted Substances and All other Monitored Drugs, in the
                  corresponding patient chart.

            (10)  Clinical Supervision

                  (a)   I, Dr. Baird, undertake to practise under the guidance of a
                        clinical supervisor(s) acceptable to the College (the "Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)"), on the terms set out below (the "Clinical
                        Supervision"). 
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Baird, undertake to meet with my Clinical Supervisor(s) at
                        least once every month to discuss the Clinical Supervisor(s)'s
                        review of:
                  
                        i.    20 charts for patients to whom I have prescribed Narcotic
                              Drugs, Narcotic Preparations, Controlled Drugs,
                              Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances and All other
                              Monitored Drugs since the Clinical Supervisor(s)'s prior
                              review, or if since the Clinical Supervisor(s)'s prior review
                              there are not 20 patients listed in the Prescribing Log to
                              whom I have prescribed Narcotic Drugs, Narcotic Preparations,
                              Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted
                              Substances and All other Monitored Drugs, then the charts of
                              all patients listed in the Prescribing Log since the Clinical
                              Supervisor's prior review; and
                        ii.   At least 15 charts of patients to whom I have initiated a new
                              prescription for:
                  
                              1.    Narcotic Drugs, or
                              2.    Narcotic Preparations; or
                              3.    Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted
                                    Substances and All other Monitored Drugs where the
                                    patient is also prescribed a Narcotic Drug and/or
                                    Narcotic Preparation,
                  
                              or if since the Clinical Supervisor(s)'s prior review there
                              are not 15 patients listed in the Prescribing Log to whom I
                              have initiated a new prescription for Narcotic Drugs,
                              Narcotic Preparations or Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines
                              and Other Targeted Substances and All other Monitored Drugs
                              where the patient is also prescribed a Narcotic Drug and/or
                              Narcotic Preparation, then the charts of all patients listed
                              in the Prescribing Log since the Clinical Supervisor's prior
                              review. 
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Baird, acknowledge that the Clinical Supervisor(s) must sign
                        and date the Prescribing Log to confirm the charts that the
                        Clinical Supervisor(s) has reviewed and discussed with me.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Baird, acknowledge that the Clinical Supervisor(s) will
                        provide a report to the College at least once every month.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Baird, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)'s undertaking, attached hereto as Schedule "E", and
                        understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor(s).  In
                        addition to what is set out above, the Clinical Supervisor(s) will,
                        at a minimum: 
                  
                        (i)   Discuss any concerns with me arising from chart reviews and
                              observations;
                  
                        (ii)  Make recommendations to me for practice improvements and
                              ongoing professional development and inquire into my
                              compliance with the recommendations; and
                  
                        (iii) Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents
                              or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues that the
                              Clinical Supervisor(s) deem necessary to my Clinical
                              Supervision.
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Baird, undertake that all meetings with my Clinical
                        Supervisor(s) will take place at my Practice Location, or another
                        Location approved by the College;
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. Baird, acknowledge that all charts reviewed shall be
                        independently selected by the Clinical Supervisor(s) based on the
                        areas of concern identified in the report of the medical inspector
                        dated March 2, 2018 and concerns that may arise during the period
                        of Clinical Supervision.
                  
                  (h)   I, Dr. Baird, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical
                        Supervision of my practice, conducted under the terms of this
                        Undertaking and Schedule "E" attached, and to abide by the
                        reasonable recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor(s), including
                        but not limited to, any reasonable recommended practice
                        improvements and ongoing professional development.
                  
                  (i)   I, Dr. Baird, undertake to ensure that Schedule "E" to this
                        Undertaking, is signed and delivered to the College within fourteen
                        (14) days of the Effective Date.
                  
                  (j)   I, Dr. Baird, undertake that if a person who has given an
                        undertaking in Schedule "E" to this Undertaking is unable or
                        unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within
                        fourteen (14) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed
                        undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who
                        is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
                        College within that time.
                  
                  (k)   I, Dr. Baird, agree that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical
                        Supervisor on the terms set out in sections (10)(i) and/or (j)
                        above, I will cease prescribing Narcotic Drugs, Narcotic
                        Preparations, Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted
                        Substances and All other Monitored Drugs until such time as I have
                        obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.  
                  
                  (l)   I, Dr. Baird, agree that if I am required to cease prescribing
                        Narcotic Drugs, Narcotic Preparations, Controlled Drugs,
                        Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances and All other
                        Monitored Drugs as a result of section (10)(k) above this will
                        constitute a term, condition or limitation on my certificate of
                        registration and that term, condition or limitation will be
                        included on the Public Register.
                  
            (11)  Professional Education  

                  (a)   I, Dr. Baird, undertake to successfully complete the following
                        elements of professional education (the "Professional Education"):
                  
                        (i)   Review and discuss with my Clinical Supervisor(s) the
                              following resources:
                  
                              1.    CPSO Policy "Prescribing Drugs":
                                    http://www.cpso.on.ca/Policies-Publications/Policy/Prescribing-Drugs;
                              2.    2017 Canadian Guideline for Opioids for Chronic
                                    Non-Cancer Pain:
                                    http://nationalpaincentre.mcmaster.ca/guidelines.html
                                    and
                  
                        (ii)  any additional professional education recommended by my
                              Clinical Supervisor(s).
                  
                  
            (12)  Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Baird, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        Location at which I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any
                        jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within ten
                        (10) business days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I
                        further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice
                        Locations within ten (10) business days of commencing practice at
                        that Location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Baird, undertake and agree that I will submit to, and not
                        interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Location(s)
                        and patient records by a College representative for the purposes of
                        monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Baird, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of the Ontario Health Insurance Plan
                        ("OHIP"), the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics
                        Monitoring System ("NMS") implemented under the Narcotics Safety
                        and Awareness Act, 2010 and/or any person or institution who may
                        have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my
                        compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Baird, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP and NMS
                        consent form(s), attached hereto as Schedule "F" and Schedule "G",
                        respectively. 
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (13)  I, Dr. Baird, acknowledge that all schedules attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (14)  I, Dr. Baird, acknowledge that I shall be solely responsible for payment
                  of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the
                  implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking. 

            (15)  I, Dr. Baird, acknowledge and confirm that I have read and understand the
                  provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal
                  counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my
                  right to do so.

            (16)  I, Dr. Baird, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking
                  to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at
                  any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff").

            (17)  I, Dr. Baird, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College.

            (18)  I, Dr. Baird, acknowledge that this entire Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (19)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Baird, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Baird, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with the section above, the following
                        summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the time
                        period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                        The College has received information regarding Dr. Baird's standard
                        of practice and conduct and is conducting an investigation into the
                        information. During the investigation and in the event of a
                        referral to the Discipline Committee,
                  
                              Dr. Baird's prescribing of narcotic drugs, narcotic
                              preparations, controlled drugs, benzodiazepines and other
                              targeted substances, and other monitored drugs will be
                              supervised by a Clinical Supervisor 
                  
                              Dr. Baird will engage in professional education in the
                              prescribing of controlled substances, including narcotics.
                  
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (20)  I, Dr. Baird, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to all Clinical Supervisors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (21)  I, Dr. Baird, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
                  Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
                  circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
                  arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (22)  I, Dr. Baird, give my irrevocable consent to all Clinical Supervisors and
                  Chiefs of Staff, to disclose to the College, and to one another, any
                  information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   relevant to the provisions of the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking
                        set out at Schedule "E";
                  
                  (c)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                        Undertaking; and/or 
                  
            (2 of 2) As from July 8, 2016, the following terms, conditions and limitations
            are imposed on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Wycliffe Hobart
            Baird in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Baird to the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:


                               UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                            ("Undertaking")

                                                  of

                                       DR. WYCLIFFE HOBART BAIRD
                                             ("Dr. Baird")

                                                  to 

                             COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                            (the "College")



            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College;
                  
                  "NMS" means the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics Monitoring
                  System implemented under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010;

                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Baird, certificate of registration number 24565, am a member of
                  the College.  The College has received information regarding my standard
                  of practice.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (3)   I, Dr. Baird, acknowledge and agree that I am bound by this Undertaking
                  from the date on which I sign it. 

            (4)   Practice Restriction

                  (a)   I, Dr. Baird, undertake that, effective immediately, I will cease
                        to engage in the practice of Emergency Medicine.
                  
                  
            (5)   Clinical Supervision 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Baird, undertake to practise under the guidance of a
                        clinical supervisor(s) acceptable to the College (the "Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)"), for at least six months in duration ("Clinical
                        Supervision"). 
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Baird, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)'s undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix "A", and
                        understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor(s). The
                        Clinical Supervisor(s) will, at minimum: 
                  
                        (i)   Facilitate the education program set out in the
                              Individualized Education Plan ("IEP") attached as Appendix
                              "B";
                  
                        (ii)  Review at least fifteen to twenty (15-20) of my patient
                              charts once every month;
                  
                        (iii) Meet with me once every month;
                  
                        (iv)  Discuss any concerns arising from the chart reviews;
                  
                        (v)   Make recommendations to me for practice improvements and
                              ongoing professional development and inquire into my
                              compliance with the recommendations; 
                  
                        (vi)  Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents
                              or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the
                              Clinical Supervisor(s) deem necessary to my Clinical
                              Supervision; and
                  
                        (vii) Submit written reports to the College at least once every
                              three months, or more frequently if the Clinical
                              Supervisor(s) has concerns about my standard of practice.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Baird, acknowledge that the charts reviewed shall be
                        selected by the Clinical Supervisor(s) based on the educational
                        needs identified in the IEP set out at Appendix "B" to my
                        Undertaking, as well as the areas of concern identified in the
                        reports of the medical inspector dated March 26, 2016 and June 13,
                        2016, and concerns that may arise during the period of Clinical
                        Supervision.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Baird, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical
                        Supervision of my practice, conducted under the term of this
                        Undertaking and Appendix "A" attached, and to abide by the
                        recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor(s), including but not
                        limited to, any recommended practice improvements and ongoing
                        professional development.
                  
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Baird, undertake to ensure that Appendix "A" to this
                        Undertaking, is signed and delivered to the College within thirty
                        (30) days of the date I execute this Undertaking.
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Baird, undertake that if a person who has given an
                        undertaking in Appendix "A" to this Undertaking is unable or
                        unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within
                        twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed
                        undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who
                        is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
                        College within that time.
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. Baird, agree that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical
                        Supervisor on the provisions set out under sections (5)(e) and/or
                        (f) above, I will cease practising medicine until such time as I
                        have obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.  
                  
                  (h)   I, Dr. Baird, agree that if I am required to cease practise as a
                        result of section (5)(g) above this will constitute a term,
                        condition or limitation on my certificate of registration and that
                        term, condition or limitation will be included on the public
                        register.
                  
            (6)   Reassessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. Baird, undertake that, approximately six (6) months after
                        the completion of the Clinical Supervision set out in section (3)
                        above and Appendix "A" attached, I will submit to a Reassessment of
                        my practice ("the Reassessment") by an assessor or assessors
                        selected by the College (the "Assessor(s)").  I acknowledge and
                        agree that the Reassessment may include a chart review, direct
                        observation of my care, interviews with colleagues and co-workers,
                        feedback from patients and any other tools deemed necessary by the
                        College.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Baird, undertake to co-operate fully with the Reassessment,
                        conducted under the term of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Baird, acknowledge and agree that my Clinical Supervisor(s)
                        may receive and review the findings of the Assessor(s), and may
                        discuss with the Assessor(s) any issues or concerns arising from
                        the Reassessment.  I also acknowledge that the results of the
                        Reassessment will be provided to me and reported to the College and
                        the report may form the basis of further action by the College. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Baird, understand and agree that if I am of the view that
                        any of the Assessor(s)'s recommendations are unreasonable, I will
                        have thirty (30) days following my receipt of the recommendations
                        within which to provide the College with my submissions in this
                        regard.  I further understand and agree that thereafter, the ICR
                        Committee will consider my submissions and make a determination
                        regarding whether or not the recommendations, or any of them, are
                        reasonable and if so, whether they, or any of them, constitute
                        limitations or restrictions on my practice, and that decision will
                        be provided to me.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Baird, undertake that, following the decision referenced in
                        section (6)(d) above, I will abide by those recommendations of the
                        Assessor(s) that the ICR Committee has determined are reasonable. 
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Baird, hereby consent to any of the following being included
                        on the public register as terms, conditions or limitations on my
                        certificate of registration, for the purposes of section 23 of the
                        Code: 
                  
                        (i)   any recommendations of the Assessor(s) which are terms,
                              conditions or limitations on my practice;  
                  
                        (ii)  any recommendations of the Assessor(s) which the ICR
                              Committee has identified in its decision referenced in
                              section (6)(d) as terms, conditions or limitations on my
                              practice.
                  
            (7)   Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Baird, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location that I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any
                        jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within
                        fifteen (15) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I
                        further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice
                        Locations within fifteen (15) days of commencing practice at that
                        location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Baird, undertake and agree that I will submit to, and not
                        interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Location(s)
                        and patient records by a College representative for the purposes of
                        monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Baird, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution
                        that may have relevant information, in order for the College to
                        monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Baird, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent
                        form, attached hereto as Appendix "C". 
                  
            (8)   I, Dr. Baird, undertake to comply with this Undertaking and acknowledge
                  that a breach by me of any provision of this Undertaking may constitute
                  an act of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and may result in
                  a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Committee of the
                  College.

            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (9)   I, Dr. Baird, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (10)  I, Dr. Baird, acknowledge that I shall be solely responsible for payment
                  of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the
                  implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking. 

            (11)  I, Dr. Baird, acknowledge and confirm that I have read and understand the
                  provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal
                  counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my
                  right to do so.

            (12)  I, Dr. Baird, acknowledge that this entire Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. I understand that this Undertaking
                  shall be information on the College's Register that is available to the
                  public during the time period that the Undertaking remains in effect.

            (13)  I, Dr. Baird, acknowledge that the following summary will appear on the
                  College's Register that is available to the public during the time of
                  Supervision and Re-assessment of his practice:

                  *     Dr. Baird will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor
                        acceptable to the College for 6 months. 
                  *     Dr. Baird's practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by
                        the College within 6 months of the end of the period of Clinical
                        Supervision.
                  
            (14)  I, Dr. Baird, acknowledge that the following summary will appear on the
                  College's Register that is available to the public during the time period
                  that this Undertaking remains in effect:

                  *     Dr. Baird does not practice Emergency Medicine. 
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (15)  I, Dr. Baird, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide this
                  Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff"), and to
                  provide said Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that
                  led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any
                  information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this
                  Undertaking.

            (16)  I, Dr. Baird, give my irrevocable consent to any person who requires this
                  information for the purposes of facilitating my compliance with this
                  undertaking and to all Clinical Supervisors, Chiefs of Staff and
                  Assessors, to disclose to the College, and to one another, any
                  information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   relevant to the provisions of the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking
                        set out at Appendix "A";
                  
                  (c)   relevant to the Reassessment; and
                  
                  (d)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                        Undertaking.

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 16 Oct 2017
Summary:

On October 16, 2017, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Wycliffe Hobart Baird committed 
an act of professional misconduct, in that he has engaged in sexual abuse of a patient and in that 
he has engaged in a conduct or an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, 
having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, 
dishonourable or unprofessional. 
 
Dr. Baird is a general practitioner who received his certificate of registration authorizing 
independent practice in Ontario in 1972. At. the relevant time, Dr. Baird practised Emergency 
Medicine at Trillium Health Partners (“the Hospital”), in Mississauga, Ontario.  
 
Patient A: Dr. Baird’s Comments of a Sexual Nature 
 
In May 2011, Patient A attended the Hospital’s emergency department in respect of a knee 
injury, sustained after falling off of her motorcycle. Mr. X, who was with Patient A at the time of 
her injury, attended at the Hospital with her. Patient A was provided with a hospital gown and 
removed her pants, so that her injury could be assessed by Dr. Baird.  
 
When Patient A asked Dr. Baird when she would be able to stand on the leg, Dr. Baird 
responded that she could stand on the leg at whatever point she was able to handle the pain. 
Patient A then asked Dr. Baird when she would be able to ride her motorcycle. Dr. Baird looked 
at Mr. X and stated words to the effect of: “he looks like a motorcycle, you could ride him.”  
 
Patient A was shocked and offended by this comment, which she perceived as sexual 
harassment. She promptly complained to the Hospital.  
 
When Dr. Baird was advised of the complaint, he expressed regret for his actions and remorse 
that the patient had been emotionally injured by the encounter. Dr. Baird agreed to write a letter 
of apology to the patient, including an assurance to the patient that as a result of this interaction 
being brought forward, he would change his behaviour.  
 
The letter of apology was not sent to Patient A. Instead, the Hospital attempted to arrange a 
meeting between Patient A and Dr. Baird.  However, Patient A rejected the invitation to meet 
with Dr. Baird.  
 
Nurse A: Dr. Baird’s Inappropriate Comments 
 
During an evening shift on April 29, 2012, Dr. Baird was the attending Emergency Room doctor. 
Nurse A was standing at the nursing station together with her co-workers when Dr. Baird was 
speaking to a patient and providing indirect instructions to the nursing staff. 
 
When the patient had left, Dr. Baird asked the nursing staff whether the instructions were 
understood. Nurse A jokingly stated that she did not understand. Dr.  Baird turned around in his 
chair to face Nurse A, patted his knees and said: “Nurse A come and sit on my lap so that I can 
spank you.” This comment was made in front of the nursing staff and two patients. Nurse A and 
her nursing colleagues then left the area.  
 
Nurse A was upset and offended as a result of Dr. Baird’s comments. At the end of the shift, 
Nurse A informed Dr. Baird that she felt uncomfortable, embarrassed and insulted by his 
comments. Dr. Baird apologized and stated that it should be taken as a joke. Nurse A filed a 
formal complaint against Dr. Baird.   
 
As a result of the complaint, Dr. Baird agreed to provide a formal letter of apology and to seek 
professional coaching with respect to eliminating inappropriate comments in the workplace, 
demonstrating professional conduct and developing a sense of empathy in order to understand 
how his comments can impact others.  
 
Dr. Baird successfully completed the professional coaching. 
 
Disposition 
 
On November 1, 2017, the Discipline Committee ordered and directed that: 
 
-   The Registrar suspend Dr. Baird’s certificate of registration for a period of two months, to 
    commence thirty (30) days from the date of this Order. 
-   The Registrar impose the following term, condition and limitation on Dr. Baird’s 
    certificate of registration: 
     -  Dr. Baird successfully complete individualized (one-on-one) instruction in medical 
        ethics, with an instructor approved by the College, at his own expense and provide 
        proof of completion to the College prior to his resumption of practice. 
-   Dr. Baird reimburse the College for funding provided to Patient A under the program 
    required under section 85.7 of the Code, by posting an irrevocable letter of credit or other 
    security acceptable to the College, within thirty days of the date of this Order, in the 
    amount of $16,060.00. 
-   Dr. Baird appear before the panel to be reprimanded within sixty (60) days of this Order. 
-   Dr. Baird pay costs to the College in the amount of $5,500.00 within thirty (30) days of 
    this Order.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): October 16, 2017


Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 16 May 1990
Summary:

 In May 1990, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Baird guilty of professional misconduct, as defined 
 in Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he charged a fee that was excessive in relation 
 to the services performed, contrary to s. 27(9); in that he failed to provide within a reasonable 
 time and without cause a report or certificate requested by a patient or his authorized agent in 
 respect of an examination or treatment performed by him, contrary to s. 27(27); and in that he 
 engaged in conduct or an act relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the 
 circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or 
 unprofessional, contrary to s. 27(32).  Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. Baird's 
 licence to practice medicine be suspended for a period of three months.

Appeal: Appeal Dismissed
Appeal Decision Date: 18 Jun 1991
Hearing Date(s): 08 Jan 1990

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: June 13, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Wycliffe Hobart Baird to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective June 13, 2018:

The College has received information regarding Dr. Baird’s standard of practice and conduct and is conducting an investigation into the information. During the investigation and in the event of a referral to the Discipline Committee,

Dr. Baird’s prescribing of narcotic drugs, narcotic preparations, controlled drugs, benzodiazepines and other targeted substances, and other monitored drugs will be supervised by a Clinical Supervisor

Dr. Baird will engage in professional education in the prescribing of controlled substances, including narcotics.


Source: Member
Active Date: July 8, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Wycliffe Hobart Baird to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective July 8, 2016:

• Dr. Baird does not practice Emergency Medicine.
Download Full Document (PDF)