Bajaj, Harminder Pal Singh (CPSO#: 92566)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Mar 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 15 Mar 2010

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Government Medical College, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 306
18 Kensington Road
Brampton ON  L6T 4S5
Phone: (905) 497-8558
Fax: 905-497-8559
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

312 Queen Street East
Brampton ON  L6V 1C2
Canada
Phone: 905-458-7377
Fax: 905-458-7477
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: H.P. Bajaj Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 18 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Bajaj ( CPSO# 92566 )

Business Address:
106 - 18 Kensington Road
Brampton ON  L6T 1S5
Phone Number: (905) 497-8558

Business Address:
312 Queen Street East
Brampton ON  L6V 1C2
Phone Number: (905) 458-7377

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 15 Mar 2010 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Mar 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Mar 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 14 Sep 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Jul 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Nov 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Nov 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Aug 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Aug 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 22 Aug 2013 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Harminder  Pal  Singh Bajaj may practice medicine independently in primary
            care, excluding paediatrics, obstetrics and gynaecology.