Bajaj, Ravi Roshan (CPSO#: 93137)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1333 Sheppard Ave E Suite 306
North York ON  M2J 1V1
Phone: 416 551 3916
Fax: (416) 907-1465
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Milton Cardiac Care
311
Toronto, ON
Milton ON  L9T 3Z9
Canada
Phone: 9058789805
Fax: 9058786358
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ravi R. Bajaj Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 20 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Bajaj ( CPSO# 93137 )

Business Address:
Milton Cardiac Care
Suite 109
311 Commercial Street
Milton ON  L9T 3Z9
Phone Number: (905) 878-9805

Business Address:
306 - 1333 Sheppard Avenue East
North York ON  M2J 1V1
Phone Number: (416) 553-3916

Business Address:
4001 Lesile Street
North York ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6000

Business Address:
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone Number: (416) 242-1000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 16 Nov 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAVI ROSHAN BAJAJ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAJAJ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014