Bakbak, Asaad Ibrahim (CPSO#: 63029)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Feb 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Feb 1999

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Al Fateh, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
117 King Street East
Oshawa ON  L1H 1B9
Phone: (905) 721-4903
Fax: (905) 723-3794
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bakbak Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 14 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Bakbak ( CPSO# 63029 )

Business Address:
117 King Street East
Oshawa ON  L1H 1B9
Phone Number: (905) 721-4903

Business Address:
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 576-8711

Business Address:
2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 4S9
Phone Number: (416) 284-8131

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 29 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ASAAD IBRAHIM BAKBAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAKBAK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 5 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Feb 1999

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: August 14, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

Note: This matter has been appealed to the Health Professions Appeal and Review Board.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)