Bakeer, Mervat (CPSO#: 92179)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jan 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Nov 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Al Quds University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Primary Care Diabetes Support Progr
346 Platt's Lane
London ON  N6G 1J1
Phone: (519) 646-6000 Ext. 67268
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Active Care Medical Centre
1807 Wonderland road north
London ON  N6G 5C2
Canada
Phone: (519) 433-2996
Fax: (519) 433-4332
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mervat Bakeer Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 25 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Bakeer ( CPSO# 92179 )

Business Address:
Primary Care Diabetes Support Program
346 Platt's Lane
London ON  N6G 1J1
Phone Number: (519) 646-6000

Business Address:
201 - 1807 Wonderland North
London ON  N6G 5C2
Phone Number: (519) 433-4330

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Dec 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MERVAT BAKEER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAKEER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 20 Oct 2009 to 12 Jan 2010
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 13 Jan 2010 to 18 Nov 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 19 Nov 2010 to 18 Nov 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 17 Jan 2012 to 16 Jan 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Nov 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Nov 2012