Baker, Blair Albert (CPSO#: 89912)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Nov 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Nov 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University College, Cork, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Milton District Hospital
725 Bronte St S
Milton ON  L9T 7H6
Phone: 905-878-2383
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Blair Albert Baker Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 08 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Baker ( CPSO# 89912 )

Business Address:
725 Bronte Street South
Milton ON  L9T 6H7
Phone Number: (905) 878-2383

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Milton Site Halton Healthcare Services Milton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Oct 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BLAIR ALBERT BAKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAKER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 06 Oct 2008 to 28 Dec 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 29 Dec 2008 to 05 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 06 Oct 2009 to 05 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 06 Oct 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Dec 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Oct 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Nov 2010