Baker, Emily Sinclair (CPSO#: 93171)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Oct 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Oct 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2000 Credit Valley Road (Suite 502)
Mississauga ON  L5M 4N4
Phone: (905) 820-8748 Ext. 239
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EMILY SINCLAIR BAKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAKER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 May 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jun 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 May 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jun 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Sep 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Oct 2016