Baker, Kimberly Jarmain (CPSO#: 93711)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Alexandra Hospital
Ingersoll Family Health Team
29 Noxon Street
Ingersoll ON  N5C 3V6
Phone: (519) 485-9617
Fax: (519) 485-9620
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K.J. Baker Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 07 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Baker ( CPSO# 93711 )

Business Address:
Ingersoll Family Health Team
Alexandra Hospital
29 Noxon Street
Ingersoll ON  N5C 3V6
Phone Number: (519) 485-9617

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Alexandra Hospital Ingersoll

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KIMBERLY JARMAIN BAKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAKER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2012