Bakr, Hatem Mohamed Abdel-Moniem (CPSO#: 90266)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 24 Feb 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 24 Feb 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Asyut University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 02 Mar 2009 to 24 Apr 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 25 Apr 2009 to 01 Mar 2010
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 Mar 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Apr 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Feb 2010