Balaban, Kayli Shira (CPSO#: 80995)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
491 Lawrence Avenue West, suite 304
North York ON  M5M1C7
Phone: 416-429-9477
Fax: 416-429-0473
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 04 May 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KAYLI SHIRA BALABAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BALABAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 May 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 May 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 2010