Balakrishnan, Sadhana Lakshmi (CPSO#: 90200)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jul 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:University of London, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
WestOak Medical Clinic
2525 Old Bronte Road Suite 200
Oakville ON  L6M 4J2
Phone: (905) 582-7533
Fax: (905) 582-0766
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sadhana Balakrishnan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 20 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Balakrishnan ( CPSO# 90200 )

Business Address:
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone Number: (905) 845-2571

Business Address:
108 - 3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1P 2T7
Phone Number: (416) 438-2911

Business Address:
WestOak Medical Clinic
Suite 200
2525 Old Bronte Road
Oakville ON  L6M 4J2
Phone Number: (905) 582-7533

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SADHANA LAKSHMI BALAKRISHNAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BALAKRISHNAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 02 Feb 2009 to 27 Feb 2009
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 06 Jun 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
Elective Trainee - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Feb 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Feb 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jun 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 2012