Balas, Najla Hasan Mahmoud (CPSO#: 81805)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Mar 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Mar 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:United Arab Emirates University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 May 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NAJLA HASAN MAHMOUD BALAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BALAS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2004 to 08 Oct 2004
PEAP - Resident - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 09 Oct 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Apr 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2009 to 31 Aug 2010
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Oct 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Mar 2013