Baldisera, Tara-Anne (CPSO#: 84217)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Nov 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 5
2120 Regent Street South
Sudbury ON  P3E 3Z9
Phone: (705) 222-3737
Fax: (705) 222-4259
Electoral District: 08
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

41 Ramsey Lake Road
Health Sciences North
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Canada
Phone: (705) 523-7100
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tara-Anne Baldisera, Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 05 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Baldisera ( CPSO# 84217 )

Business Address:
Unit 5
2120 Regent Street South
Sudbury ON  P3E 3Z9
Phone Number: (705) 222-3737

Business Address:
Health Sciences North
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 523-7100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 29 Sep 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TARA-ANNE BALDISERA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BALDISERA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2008 to 05 Apr 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 06 Apr 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Nov 2009