Baldo, Allain (CPSO#: 71274)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Cardiovascular Centre
502 - 1355 Bank Street
Ottawa ON  K1H 8K7
Phone: (613) 738-1584
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Allain Baldo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 27 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Baldo ( CPSO# 71274 )

Business Address:
Ottawa Cardiovascular Centre
Suite 502
1355 Bank Street
Ottawa ON  K1H 8K7
Phone Number: (613) 738-9097

Business Address:
Montfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone Number: (613) 746-4621

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALLAIN BALDO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BALDO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2001