Balendran, Nalayini (CPSO#: 81768)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Sinhalese, Tamil

Education:Monash University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
13, Spring Street
Chatswood
Sydney 2067
Australia
Phone: 02 8423 2700
Fax: 02 9410 0244
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: N. Balendran Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 14 2011


Corporation Name: N. Balendran Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 11 2013

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Australia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 16 May 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NALAYINI BALENDRAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BALENDRAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 16 Sep 2004
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 17 Sep 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Oct 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Nov 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Oct 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2011