Bali, Amardeep Kaur (CPSO#: 93296)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Apr 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Apr 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Spanish, Urdu

Education:Universidad Iberoamericana(UNIBE), 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Tokoroa Medical Centre
57-75 Maraetai Rd
Tokoroa 3420
New Zealand
Phone: 07886877
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. K. Bali Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 07 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Bali ( CPSO# 93296 )

Business Address:
Suite 105
641 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6C 2T9
Phone Number: (519) 686-8585

Business Address:
1345 Huron Street
London ON  N5Z 2E3
Phone Number: (519) 659-2331

Business Address:
215 Fanshawe Park Road West
Suite 104
London ON  N6G 5A9
Phone Number: (519) 488-3303

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

New Zealand

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Dec 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMARDEEP KAUR BALI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BALI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 23 Sep 2010
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Aug 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Nov 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Apr 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2014