Balila, Maida Moustafa Mohammed Abdul Aal (CPSO#: 83785)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 04 Apr 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 04 Apr 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 13 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 19 Oct 2005 to 13 Dec 2005
Elective Trainee - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 10 Mar 2008 to 04 Apr 2008
Elective Trainee - Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Dec 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Mar 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Apr 2008