Balla, Agneta (CPSO#: 89263)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Aug 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Aug 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Hungarian

Education:McGill University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 104
2555 St Joseph Boulevard
Orleans ON  K1C 1S6
Phone: (613) 830-1298
Fax: (613) 830-2170
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Balla Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 09 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Balla ( CPSO# 89263 )

Business Address:
Suite 104
2555 St. Joseph Boulevard
Orleans ON  K1C 1S6
Phone Number: (613) 830-1298

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Aug 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AGNETA BALLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BALLA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 02 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 03 Aug 2010 to 02 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 Aug 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 2011