Ballard, Tonya Gale (CPSO#: 80749)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Cambridge Centre for Health
and Wellness
Unit B4D
350 Conestoga Bouelvard
Cambridge ON  N1R 7L7
Phone: (519) 624-5999
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tonya Ballard Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 07 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Ballard ( CPSO# 80749 )

Business Address:
The Cambridge Centre for Health & Wellness
Unit B4D
350 Conestoga Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 7L7
Phone Number: (519) 624-5999

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TONYA GALE BALLARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BALLARD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010