Ballon, Lawrence Lionel (CPSO#: 20898)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Date of Death: 18-Jan-2018

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 161 Admiral Rd Toronto, ON M5R 2L7
Date Received: 04 May 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 15 Nov 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1967
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017