Ballyk, Peter Donald (CPSO#: 73832)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jul 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Health Centre
Diagnostic Imaging Department
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6010
Fax: (416) 530-6025
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: T.M. Williams Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 5 2017


Corporation Name: Ballyk Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 05 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Ballyk ( CPSO# 73832 )

Business Address:
St Joseph's Health Centre
Diagnostic Imaging Department
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6001

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER DONALD BALLYK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BALLYK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 24 Sep 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 25 Sep 2001 to 24 Sep 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 25 Sep 2002 to 24 Sep 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 25 Sep 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 2004